Bernstein, Mark Aaron (CPSO#: 50142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4W-451
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6499
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Temmy Latner Centre For
Palliative Care
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 1545
Fax: (416) 586-4804
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Bernstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bernstein ( CPSO# 50142 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4W - 451
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6499


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK AARON BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1983