Berrang, Tanya Suzanne (CPSO#: 76486)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 21 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2006