Berris, Kenneth Hugh (CPSO#: 27939)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992