Berry, Marian Elisabeth (CPSO#: 53012)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Roke, Marian Elisabeth (used until: 15 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jun 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2010