Berry, Raymond Edward (CPSO#: 59359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab
E W Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 2286
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Berry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Berry ( CPSO# 59359 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab
E W Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND EDWARD BERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1990