Berry, Scott Robert (CPSO#: 62454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
T2 036
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Berry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Berry ( CPSO# 62454 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite T2 - 036
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT ROBERT BERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991