Berry, William Arthur David (CPSO#: 71294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renal Clinic
750 Great Northern Rd.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3862
Fax: (705) 759-4999
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.A.D. Berry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Berry ( CPSO# 71294 )

Business Address:
Renal Clinic
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ARTHUR DAVID BERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Jan 2002
Elective Trainee - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002