Berthold, Dominik Rudolf (CPSO#: 82162)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bologna, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 24 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007