Bertley, John (CPSO#: 61276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204 Richmond Street
Thorold ON  L2V 5A7
Phone: (905) 682-1400
Fax: (905) 682-1468
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

204 Richmond Street
Thorold ON  L2V 5A7
Canada
Phone: (905) 682-1400
Fax: (905) 682-1468
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Bertley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertley ( CPSO# 61276 )

Business Address:
204 Richmond Street
Thorold ON  L2V 5A7
Phone Number: (905) 682-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BERTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1990