Bertok, Larissa (CPSO#: 89798)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Trieste, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Resident - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009