Bertolo, Monica Linda (CPSO#: 77536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
318 Ontario Street
st. catharines
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone: (905) 682-0444
Fax: (905) 682-7721
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mountain medical Walk-In clinic
880 upper wentworth
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-0808
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

GLENRIDGE WALK IN CLINIC
209 GLENRIDGE AVENUE
St Catharines ON  L2T3J6
Canada
Phone: 289 362 5333
Fax: 289 362 5335
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monica Bertolo Medicine Professioinal Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertolo ( CPSO# 77536 )

Business Address:
Glenridge Walk-In Clinic
5 - 209 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 3J6
Phone Number: (289) 362-5333

Business Address:
Mountain Medical Walk-In Clinic
880 Upper Wentworth
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 575-0808

Business Address:
Ontario Street Walk-In
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone Number: (905) 682-0444

Business Address:
Walmart Waterdown Clinic
90 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H2
Phone Number: (905) 690-1418

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA LINDA BERTOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTOLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004