Bertram, Barbara Ophelia Belen (CPSO#: 84264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
Department of Anaesthesia
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5407
Fax: (519) 464-4486
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Bertram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bertram ( CPSO# 84264 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Department of Anaesthesia
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA OPHELIA BELEN BERTRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011