Bertram, Jennifer Catherine (CPSO#: 104992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: Laba, Jennifer Catherine (used until: 28 Mar 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5115 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1C2
Phone: (519) 945-4503
Fax: 519-974-6377
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER CATHERINE BERTRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTRAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016