Bertrand, Danielle (CPSO#: 61386)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Mar 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 1995