Bertrand, Monique Adele Marie (CPSO#: 50145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
LHSC - Victoria Campus
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55643
Fax: (519) 685-8663
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monique A. Bertrand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bertrand ( CPSO# 50145 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Campus
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
C510 - 800 Commissioners Raod East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-3088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIQUE ADELE MARIE BERTRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTRAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004