Bertrand, Raymond Jean (CPSO#: 62445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Espanola Regional Hospital
825 Mckinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Bertrand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bertrand ( CPSO# 62445 )

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 859-1420

Medical Records Location

Address: 21 Saturn Court Sudbury, ON P3E 6B8
Instructions: Please request medical records in writing to Dr. Bertrand
Date Received: 31 Jan 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND JEAN BERTRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTRAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991