Bertucci, Vincenzo (CPSO#: 60795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-4415
Fax: (905) 850-5517
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7546
Fax: (416) 323-6306
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENZO BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990