Berube, Marie-Eve (CPSO#: 98371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214-4275 Innes road
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone: 613-424-6343
Fax: 613-424-6422
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

B1060 - 801 Aviation drive
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Canada
Phone: 613-742-2493 Ext. 2067
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal road
Orleans ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marie-Eve Berube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Berube ( CPSO# 98371 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0S2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Suite B 1060
801 Aviation Parkway
Ottawa ON  K1K 4R3
Phone Number: (613) 742-4293

Business Address:
Suite 104
4275 Innes
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 424-6343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-EVE BERUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERUBE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014