Berzen, Alan (CPSO#: 57517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
441 Clark Avenue West
Suite 202
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W7
Phone: (905) 764-5114
Fax: (905) 764-9615
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Berzen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berzen ( CPSO# 57517 )

Business Address:
202 - 441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone Number: (905) 764-5114

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN BERZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERZEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986