Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Berzowski, Anna Malgorzata (CPSO#: 63373)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014