Besant, Joan Eleanor (CPSO#: 54284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997