Beseikri, Naeima Khalifa (CPSO#: 74218)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2007