Beshai, Safa Saber Gabera (CPSO#: 59214)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Nov 1988
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 24 Jul 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 25 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 24 Jul 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 25 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 24 Jul 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 25 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 25 Jul 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 26 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997