Bessissow, Amal (CPSO#: 100170)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Brossard QC  J4X 2R7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015