Beswick, Melanie Brooke (CPSO#: 98081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: (647) 827-9202
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zochowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zochowski ( CPSO# 98487 )
Dr. M. Beswick ( CPSO# 98081 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2

Business Address:
Queens Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE BROOKE BESWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESWICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014