Bethune, David Scott (CPSO#: 57128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sutter Gould Medical Group
2545 W Hammer Lane
Stockton CA  95209
United States
Phone: (209) 948-1641
Fax: (209) 951-2433

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT BETHUNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BETHUNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987