Betlen, Cerasela Elena (CPSO#: 87450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4742
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Cerasela Betlen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Betlen ( CPSO# 87450 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CERASELA ELENA BETLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BETLEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012