Betschel, Stephen Daniel (CPSO#: 72384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3056
Fax: (416) 864-6046
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Allergy Group (West)
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 Sunnyside Avenue, Suite 4S-412
East Wing of Sunnyside Building
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (647) 346-7766
Fax: (647) 346-7785
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Allergy Group
Michael Garron Hospital
650 Sammon Avenue
Suite 404, "K" Wing
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-7999
Fax: (416) 461-8999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN DANIEL BETSCHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BETSCHEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003