Betts, Douglas Hilchie (CPSO#: 17955)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001