Beveridge, John Massey Blaylock (CPSO#: 62196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MASSEY BLAYLOCK BEVERIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEVERIDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991