Beyak, Michael John (CPSO#: 70392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2288
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN BEYAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEYAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009