Bezjak, Andrea (CPSO#: 60009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiation Medicine Program
UHN-Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Room 7-215
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-2936
Fax: (416) 946-6561
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA BEZJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEZJAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990