Bhabha, Cassim Ahomed (CPSO#: 22809)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Apr 1991
Summary:

 In April 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bhabha guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within 
 a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his 
 authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Bhabha be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register.  The Committee also ruled that the Doctor be fined $500.00, to be paid within thirty 
 days of the Order becoming final.  Failure to pay the fine within this period would result in 
 suspension of licence until such time as the amount was paid.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Apr 1991


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 May 1980
Summary:

 In May 1980, Dr. Bhabha pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant 
 to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea, and found Dr. Bhabha guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Bhabha's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, 
 and that he be fined $5000.00.  The Committee further ruled that, if Dr. Bhabha satisfied the 
 College within three months of the Order becoming final that he had made all reasonable efforts to 
 enter into new leasing arrangements so as to divest himself of any further conflict of interest, 
 the penalty of suspension of the Doctor's licence would itself be suspended and replaced by a 
 reprimand.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 27 May 1980