Bhachu, Sandeep Singh (CPSO#: 85704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 27 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 21 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Queen's University, 22 Dec 2008 to 21 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Dec 2009 to 21 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Dec 2010 to 21 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2017