Bhagirath, Vikas Chander (CPSO#: 84238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nation River Health Clinic
494 Fred Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-0915
Fax: (613) 774-0916
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhagirath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Berger ( CPSO# 84237 )
Dr. V. Bhagirath ( CPSO# 84238 )

Business Address:
Nation River Health Clinic
494 Fred Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-0915


Corporation Name: Pamela Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Berger ( CPSO# 84237 )
Dr. V. Bhagirath ( CPSO# 84238 )

Business Address:
201-1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 722-5793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAS CHANDER BHAGIRATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGIRATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008