Bhalla, Sanjiv Kumar (CPSO#: 71068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology
13750 96th Avenue
Surrey BC  V3V 1Z2
Phone: (604) 581-2211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJIV KUMAR BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013