Bhan, Sasha Neal (CPSO#: 88490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St. E.
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2860
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

P.E.C. Memorial Hospital
403 Main St. E.
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King St.
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

L.A.C.G. Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr.
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

North Hastings Hospital
1-H Manor Ln.
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhan ( CPSO# 88490 )
Dr. H. Bhan ( CPSO# 90649 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
P.E.C. Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospitla
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6

Business Address:
North Hastings Hospital
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0

Business Address:
L.A.C.G. Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SASHA NEAL BHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014