Bhanabhai, Hitesh Baldev (CPSO#: 91034)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Manitoulin Health Centre, 2120 Hwy 551, Mindemoya, ON P0P 1S0
Date Received: 14 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015