Bhandhal, Sharn Harpal (CPSO#: 77548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pune, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 320
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-9046
Fax: (905) 842-9047
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Hospital (OTMH)
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON  L7R 3Z6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sharn Bhandhal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhandhal ( CPSO# 77548 )

Business Address:
Suite 320
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 220-4926

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARN HARPAL BHANDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANDHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2005