Bhangoo, Baljoet Singh (CPSO#: 107478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  02 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Baljoet  Singh  Bhangoo  may  practise  anesthesiology  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College, at the
                  following locations: 

                  (i)   McMaster University Medical Centre in Hamilton, Ontario; and
                  
                  (ii)  Juravinski Hospital in Hamilton, Ontario. 
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Bhangoo's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Bhangoo's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining  to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Bhangoo's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 3, 2017, and will expire on or before
                  October 2, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.