Bhangoo, Sandip (CPSO#: 99862)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Feb 2013 to 06 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2016