Bhangu, Raminder Kaur (CPSO#: 63175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1994

Summary

Former Name: Rai, Raminder Kaur (used until: 28 Feb 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
po box 835
troy MI  48099
United States
Phone: 8106067155
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3605
Genesys Parkway
Grand Blanc MI  48439
United States
Phone: 810 606 7152
Fax: 810 606 7155
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMINDER KAUR BHANGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 1 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1994