Bharadwaj, Steven Charles (CPSO#: 87983)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 06 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 31 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2008