Bharatwal, Veera (CPSO#: 83485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lighthouse Medical Imaging
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100 / 105
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: 416-499-3559
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bharatwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bharatwal ( CPSO# 83485 )

Business Address:
Suite LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-5940

Business Address:
Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 499-3559

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VEERA BHARATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007