Bhardwaj, Kunj Behari (CPSO#: 32844)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 26 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1977 to 14 Jun 1978
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1979 to 14 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 31 Aug 1981
Other - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2005
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 26 May 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2006
Summary:

 On May 26, 2006, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bhardwaj has committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O. Reg 856/93, in that he has engaged in conduct 
 or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  The Committee also found that Dr. Bhardwaj is incompetent as defined by 
 subsection 52(1) of the Code, in that his care of patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or 
 judgment or disregard for the welfare of his patients of a nature or to an extent that 
 demonstrates that he is unfit to continue practice or that his practice should be restricted.  The 
 Committee would have found that Dr. Bhardwaj had committed an act of professional misconduct under 
 paragraph 1(1)2 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that he has failed to meet the standard of practice of the 
 profession, in the event that it did not make a finding of incompetence.  The Notice of Hearing 
 presented the allegation of incompetence and failing to maintain the standard as alternative 
 allegations.

On May 26, 2006, the Discipline Committee directed that:

1.	The Registrar revoke 
 Dr. Bhardwaj's certificate of registration effective immediately.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2006