Bhargava, Manoj (CPSO#: 65230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 741-9271
Fax: (416) 745-9146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Bhargava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhargava ( CPSO# 65230 )

Business Address:
315 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 741-9271

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANOJ BHARGAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARGAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993