Bhaskaran, Archana (CPSO#: 99204)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014