Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bhat, Khandige Rama (CPSO#: 25090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 884-0888
Fax: (905) 884-0889
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.R. Bhat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bhat ( CPSO# 25090 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 884-0888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Mar 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHANDIGE RAMA BHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1972