Bhat, Mamatha Pallavi (CPSO#: 87824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Kannada

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Multi Organ Transplant Program
Peter Munk Building, 11-183
585 University Avenue, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhat ( CPSO# 87824 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Multi Organ Transplant Program
11 PMBL 83
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAMATHA PALLAVI BHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2015