Bhatia, Gargi (CPSO#: 31240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Vikram University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
86 Angeline Street South
Suite 204
Lindsay ON  K9V 6C5
Phone: (705) 324-7090
Fax: (705) 324-7091
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gargi Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bhatia ( CPSO# 31240 )

Business Address:
204 - 86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 6C5
Phone Number: (705) 324-7090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARGI BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1979